Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/13/2021 at 08:17:57 (UTC).

KATRINA BIVIENS WARREN VS JONATHAN WARREN

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 KATRINA BIVIENS WARREN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JONATHAN WARREN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALEY, RUSSELL L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALEY, RUSSELL L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KATRINA BIVIENS WARREN

Orange Park, FL 32073

Respondent

JONATHAN WARREN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

5/5/2021- D15- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JONATHAN WARREN ON 4/20/21

4/26/2021- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JONATHAN WARREN ON 4/20/21

PROOF OF RESIDENCY

4/15/2021- D10- PROOF OF RESIDENCY

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

4/20/2021- D13- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JONATHAN WARREN

4/15/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JONATHAN WARREN

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D11- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860216

4/14/2021- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860216

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JONATHAN WARREN ON 4/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED AND PROVIDED TO LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; PROOF OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JONATHAN WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/POSTAL CHARGES/FAM SERV/$12; Assessed : $12.00; Paid : $12.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; SUMMONS($10/EA) 10.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; POSTAL CHGS/FAM SVCS/$12 12.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less