This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/27/2022 at 15:15:09 (UTC).

KATHLEEN SCOBLE VS FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 KATHLEEN SCOBLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHLEEN SCOBLE

Jacksonville, FL 32022

Defendants

RICHARD EARL DAVIS

Callahan, FL 32011

FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

1201 Hays Street, Corporation Service Company

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, James D III

50 N Laura St Ste 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3646

Defendant Attorney

Viggiani, John

4190 Belfort Rd Ste 222

Jacksonville, FL 32216-1459

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

5/17/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/17/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED (CORPORATE) TO FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

5/17/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED (CORPORATE) TO FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD EARL DAVIS

5/17/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD EARL DAVIS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLTF)

5/17/2022- D6- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLTF)

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4153912

5/18/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4153912

ORDER ON PLTF. MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER-ACCURATE SERVE

5/20/2022- D9- ORDER ON PLTF. MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER-ACCURATE SERVE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTRE, INC, REG. AGENT 05/23/2022 1:20 PM

6/10/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTRE, INC, REG. AGENT 05/23/2022 1:20 PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN VIGGIANI FOR FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

6/13/2022- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN VIGGIANI FOR FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

6/13/2022- D12- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

6/13/2022- D13- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

6/13/2022- D14- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

6/13/2022- D15- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO: RICHARD EARL DAVIS (SUB. SERV. TO TRAVIS HORN, CO-RESIDENT) ON 06/09/22 @ 07:01 P.M.

6/16/2022- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO: RICHARD EARL DAVIS (SUB. SERV. TO TRAVIS HORN, CO-RESIDENT) ON 06/09/22 @ 07:01 P.M.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/17/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO: RICHARD EARL DAVIS (SUB. SERV. TO TRAVIS HORN, CO-RESIDENT) ON 06/09/22 @ 07:01 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT FEROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCT INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN VIGGIANI FOR FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTRE, INC, REG. AGENT 05/23/2022 1:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2022; ORDER ON PLTF. MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER-ACCURATE SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4153912

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD EARL DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED (CORPORATE) TO FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FERROVIAL SERVICES INFRASTRUCTURE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS BROADSPECTRUM INFRASTRUCTURE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Viggiani, John