Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/13/2021 at 08:16:37 (UTC).

KAREN HERNANDEZ VS AUBREY GARRY PHAIR

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 KAREN HERNANDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AUBREY GARRY PHAIR. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAREN HERNANDEZ

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Respondent

AUBREY GARRY PHAIR

Hagerstown, MD 21740

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Blaesser, Kevin Robert

2301 Park Ave Ste 404

Orange Park, FL 32073-5568

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862169

4/15/2021- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862169

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KEVIN BLAESSER FOR KAREN HERNANDEZ

4/15/2021- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KEVIN BLAESSER FOR KAREN HERNANDEZ

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D7- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED AUBREY GARRY PHAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KEVIN BLAESSER FOR KAREN HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - CHILD SUPPORT JJ042861-02 VIRGINIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/ KAREN HERNANDEZ/ ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less