This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/06/2022 at 00:11:42 (UTC).

KAREN HARRELL VS CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 KAREN HARRELL filed an Other lawsuit against CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN HARRELL

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

2430 Estancia Boulevard, Suite 114

Clearwater, FL 33609

CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

2430 Estancia Boulevard, Suite 114

Clearwater, FL 33761

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foster, Edward L III

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Other Attorneys

Hanratty, James Patrick

200 W Forsyth St Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4327

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/31/22 AT 9AM VIA ZOOM

8/4/2022- D39- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/31/22 AT 9AM VIA ZOOM

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

8/1/2022- D38- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLTF'S)

7/26/2022- D37- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLTF'S)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SECOND) TO PLTF

7/1/2022- D36- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SECOND) TO PLTF

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 6/13/22 @ 925AM

6/24/2022- D35- SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 6/13/22 @ 925AM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 6/29/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

6/20/2022- D34- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 6/29/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 7/29/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

6/8/2022- D33- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 7/29/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC 6-29-2022@10AM

6/3/2022- D32- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC 6-29-2022@10AM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLAINTIFF'S) DUCES TECUM - THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF SP OV APARTMENTS LLC 6-29-2022@10AM

6/3/2022- D31- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLAINTIFF'S) DUCES TECUM - THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF SP OV APARTMENTS LLC 6-29-2022@10AM

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4017814

10/27/2021- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4017814

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

10/26/2021- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

10/26/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

10/26/2021- D7- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

10/26/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

10/26/2021- D5- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

10/26/2021- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

COMPLAINT

10/26/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

10/26/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/31/22 AT 9AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/1/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLTF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/2/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SECOND) TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 6/13/22 @ 925AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 6/29/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF TUESDAE FRAZIER ON 7/29/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/3/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC 6-29-2022@10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/3/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLAINTIFF'S) DUCES TECUM - THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF SP OV APARTMENTS LLC 6-29-2022@10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2022; PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4017814

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT SP OV APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT CAMBRIDGE MANAGEMENT OF WASHINGTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2021; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cambridge Management Of Washington Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SP OV APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hanratty, James Patrick