This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 12/02/2021 at 00:54:00 (UTC).

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP VS FLORINE SINGLETARY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FLORINE SINGLETARY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP

2807 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendants

FLORINE SINGLETARY

Jacksonville, FL 32209

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY

Jacksonville, FL 32209

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Jacksonville, FL 32209

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Geraci, Nicholas August

2807 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32804-4411

Vamvas, Anthony Demetrius IV

2807 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32804-4411

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY VAMVAS IV FOR JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

11/9/2021- D24- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY VAMVAS IV FOR JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

NOTICE OF SERVICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - COPY OF ORDER PROVIDED TO ALL ON SERVICE LIST

10/25/2021- D23- NOTICE OF SERVICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - COPY OF ORDER PROVIDED TO ALL ON SERVICE LIST

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12-15-21 @ 9 AM IN RM 510; - LOSS MIT. ONGOING NOT AT ISSUE

10/20/2021- D22- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12-15-21 @ 9 AM IN RM 510; - LOSS MIT. ONGOING NOT AT ISSUE

NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER FOR CMC ON 10/19/21 9AM

10/8/2021- D20- NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER FOR CMC ON 10/19/21 9AM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY; UNKNOWN TENANT #1; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

8/24/2021- D19- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY; UNKNOWN TENANT #1; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED : UNKNOWN TENANT # ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

8/24/2021- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED : UNKNOWN TENANT # ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED : UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

8/24/2021- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED : UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE : FLORINE SINGLETARY ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

8/24/2021- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE : FLORINE SINGLETARY ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 8/18/2021 @ 6:10 PM

8/24/2021- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 8/18/2021 @ 6:10 PM

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

8/17/2021- D13- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,086.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3964176

8/16/2021- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $1,086.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3964176

COMPLAINT

8/16/2021- D10- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

8/16/2021- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

8/16/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY

8/16/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY

SUMMONS ISSUED FLORINE SINGLETARY

8/16/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED FLORINE SINGLETARY

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

8/16/2021- D5- CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19869 PAGE 1373-1374

8/16/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19869 PAGE 1373-1374

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY VAMVAS IV FOR JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/25/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - COPY OF ORDER PROVIDED TO ALL ON SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12-15-21 @ 9 AM IN RM 510; - LOSS MIT. ONGOING NOT AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2021; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 12/15/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 PER COURT CALENDAR 10/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2021; NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER FOR CMC ON 10/19/21 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY; UNKNOWN TENANT #1; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED : UNKNOWN TENANT # ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED : UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY ON 8/18/21 @ 6:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FLORINE SINGLETARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FLORINE SINGLETARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19869 PAGE 1373-1374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAMVAS, ANTHONY D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS A GERACI