This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 18:12:19 (UTC).

JOHN N. POLK Et Al VS OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATIO Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 JOHN N POLK filed an Other lawsuit against OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATIO. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN N. POLK

Jacksonville, FL 32218

JULIE POLK

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Defendants

PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT C

841 Prudential Dr

Jacksonville, FL 32207

SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC., A FLOR

841 Prudential Dr, Suite 1802

Jacksonville, FL 32207

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATIO

One Carrier Place

Farmington, CT 06032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kurtz, William W Jr

301 W Bay St Ste 14133

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5184

Defendant Attorneys

Erickson, Travase Lloyd

Attorney at Saalfield Shad PA

245 Riverside Ave Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4926

Sacks, Robert Eric

Attorney at Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Herma

Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Herma, 7777 Glades Rd Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434-4193

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/14/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/14/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

6/14/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC.

6/14/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

6/14/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4172118

6/15/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4172118

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TRAVASE ERICKSON FOR PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT C DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/11/2022- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TRAVASE ERICKSON FOR PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT C DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT SACKS FOR OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATIO DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/22/2022- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT SACKS FOR OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATIO DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

7/22/2022- D11- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS , MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY DEFTS., SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC. AND PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

7/28/2022- D12- MOTION TO DISMISS , MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY DEFTS., SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC. AND PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2022; MOTION TO DISMISS , MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY DEFTS., SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC. AND PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT SACKS FOR OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATIO DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/11/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TRAVASE ERICKSON FOR PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT C DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4172118

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAVILION HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAVASE ERICKSON