This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 19:04:01 (UTC).

JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC DBA SPINAL INJURY CENTERS (ASSIGNEE OF MCKNIGHT, RUSHON) VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC DBA SPINAL INJURY CENTERS ASSIGNEE OF MCKNIGHT, RUSHON filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC DBA SPINAL INJURY CENTERS (ASSIGNEE OF MCKNIGHT, RUSHON)

4800 N. Federal Hwy, Suite D204

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, Service Process Station, P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clemente, Allegra Phillips

51 Sw 1St Ave Ste 504

Miami, FL 33130-1623

Defendant Attorney

Clark, Eduardo Alberto

200 W Forsyth St Ste 1020

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4354

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

3/18/2022- D24- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY (DEFENDANT'S)

3/18/2022- D23- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY (DEFENDANT'S)

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF

3/11/2022- D22- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

3/11/2022- D21- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

3/11/2022- D20- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

3/11/2022- D19- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

3/11/2022- D18- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

3/9/2022- D17- NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) 2017 PIP STATUTE

3/9/2022- D16- NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) 2017 PIP STATUTE

SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

12/22/2021- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4053776

12/22/2021- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4053776

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -PLAINTIFF

12/21/2021- D8- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

12/21/2021- D7- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

12/21/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)/FIRST TO DEFENDANT

12/21/2021- D5- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)/FIRST TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

12/21/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

12/21/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

12/21/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/21/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2022; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2022; NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2022; NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) 2017 PIP STATUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4053776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)/FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP, LLC D/B/A SPINAL INJURY CENTERS AS ASSIGNEE DONISHA SOLOMON is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clark, Eduardo A