This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/07/2023 at 01:11:28 (UTC).

JERRY E DELGADO VS PATRICIA H DELGADO

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 JERRY E DELGADO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PATRICIA H DELGADO. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HORKAN, MAUREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HORKAN, MAUREEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JERRY E DELGADO

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

Respondent

PATRICIA H DELGADO

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

Not Classified By Court

JOY A LLOYD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Zima, Rebecca Nikirk

1835 Eastwest Pkwy Ste 1

Fleming Island, FL 32003-5310

Respondent Attorney

Phillips, Michael Randolph

541 E Monroe St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2860

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Lordahl, Joy A

3529 Tiara Way W

Jacksonville, FL 32223-7379

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REBECCA ZIMA FOR JERRY DELGADO

11/3/2022- D3- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REBECCA ZIMA FOR JERRY DELGADO

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4273237

11/3/2022- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4273237

COVER SHEET

11/3/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN ATY/FOR PETITIONER

11/3/2022- D4- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN ATY/FOR PETITIONER

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ETC (UNSIGNED/CUSTOMER WAS NOTIFIED OF THIS UNSIGNED PETITION. HE TITLED IT SUMMON)

11/3/2022- D5- PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ETC (UNSIGNED/CUSTOMER WAS NOTIFIED OF THIS UNSIGNED PETITION. HE TITLED IT SUMMON)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

11/3/2022- D6- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 -TO PATRICIA

11/3/2022- D7- REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 -TO PATRICIA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL PHILLIPS FOR PATRICIA DELGADO

11/14/2022- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL PHILLIPS FOR PATRICIA DELGADO

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4280222

11/16/2022- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4280222

ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN - ATTY FOR WIFE

11/16/2022- D11- ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN - ATTY FOR WIFE

MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS & FACULTIES / ATTY FOR WIFE

11/16/2022- D13- MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS & FACULTIES / ATTY FOR WIFE

ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION - JERRY E. DELGADO / ATTY

11/21/2022- D15- ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION - JERRY E. DELGADO / ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; NOTICE OF PROVIDING SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY/PATRICIA DELGADO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; NOTICE OF HEARING - MARCH 7, 2023 AT 930AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2023; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE / PATRICIA H. DELGADO / MICHAEL R. PHILLIPS, ESQ., ATTY FOR WIFE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2023; MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/17/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/17/2023; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; NOTICE OF COURT REPORTER ATTENDING HEARING ON 3/30/2023 @ 2:00PM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 3/30/2023 @ 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2023; OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE- PATRICIA DELGADO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2022; Order of Referral to General Magistrate - Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed: $409.00; Paid: $409.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4273237

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 -TO PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ETC (UNSIGNED/CUSTOMER WAS NOTIFIED OF THIS UNSIGNED PETITION. HE TITLED IT SUMMON)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN ATY/FOR PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REBECCA ZIMA FOR JERRY DELGADO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less