This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/24/2022 at 15:04:37 (UTC).

JENNIFER JENKINS-MARTIN VS THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 JENNIFER JENKINS-MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE HERTZ CORPORATION. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER JENKINS-MARTIN

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Austin Tyler

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

5/13/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/13/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE HERTZ CORPORATION

5/13/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE HERTZ CORPORATION

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4152243

5/13/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4152243

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON THE HERTZ CORPORATION ON MAY 25, 2022 AT 03:00 P.M. BY LISA HOWARD AS INTAKE SPECIALIST

5/31/2022- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON THE HERTZ CORPORATION ON MAY 25, 2022 AT 03:00 P.M. BY LISA HOWARD AS INTAKE SPECIALIST

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON THE HERTZ CORPORATION ON MAY 25, 2022 AT 03:00 P.M. BY LISA HOWARD AS INTAKE SPECIALIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4152243

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Austin Tyler