This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/29/2022 at 11:35:38 (UTC).

JEFFREY COYLE VS MEGHAN COYLE

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 JEFFREY COYLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEGHAN COYLE. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HORKAN, MAUREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HORKAN, MAUREEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEFFREY COYLE

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Respondent

MEGHAN COYLE

Unknown, FL 00000

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sussman, Stephanie Ann

1200 Riverplace Blvd Ste 850

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1852

Respondent Attorney

Frazier, Sara Beth

10175 Fortune Pkwy Unit 503

Jacksonville, FL 32256-6751

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Zahler, Jonathan Ashley

1830 Atlantic Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207-3404

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/16/2022- D10- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL STEPHANIE SUSSMAN FOR JEFFREY COYLE

3/16/2022- D4- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL STEPHANIE SUSSMAN FOR JEFFREY COYLE

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4110029

3/16/2022- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4110029

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/JEFFREY COYLE ATTY

3/16/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/JEFFREY COYLE ATTY

COVER SHEET

3/16/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

3/16/2022- D5- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

NOTICE PF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW CINTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL PROCEEDINGS

3/16/2022- D6- NOTICE PF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW CINTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES (HUSBAND'S)

3/16/2022- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES (HUSBAND'S)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/16/2022- D8- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT -JEFFREY COYLE

3/16/2022- D9- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT -JEFFREY COYLE

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4115567

3/24/2022- D13- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4115567

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SARA FRAZIER FOR MEGHAN COYLE

3/25/2022- D15- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SARA FRAZIER FOR MEGHAN COYLE

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL OT ENFORCEMENT PROCEEDINGS

3/29/2022- D18- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL OT ENFORCEMENT PROCEEDINGS

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4119001

3/29/2022- D19- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4119001

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SARA FRAZIER FOR MEGHAN COYLE AMENDED

4/19/2022- D21- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SARA FRAZIER FOR MEGHAN COYLE AMENDED

ANSWER (WIFE'S) TO HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

3/29/2022- D16- ANSWER (WIFE'S) TO HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF/MEGHAN COYLE/ATTY

5/12/2022- D26- MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF/MEGHAN COYLE/ATTY

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2022; MOTION TO SET HEARING -MEGHAN COYLE / ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY OF SARA FRAZIER (JULY 21-29)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE -STACEY DEVALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JEFFREY COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL OR ENFORCEMENT PROCEEDINGS - JEFFREY COYLE TO MEGHAN COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /MEGHAN COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO STANDARD FAMIY LAW INTERROGATORIES/MEGHAN COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /MEGHAN COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2022; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /JEFFREY COYLE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT -JEFFREY COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES (HUSBAND'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; NOTICE PF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW CINTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL STEPHANIE SUSSMAN FOR JEFFREY COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/JEFFREY COYLE ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zahler, Jonathan Ashley