This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/27/2022 at 00:03:32 (UTC).

JEFFREY C JOHNSON VS FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 JEFFREY C JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY C JOHNSON

Lake Wales, FL 33898

Defendants

FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

C/O Registered Agent Kathleen H. Cold, 10151 Deerwood Park Blvd, Bldg 300, Ste 300

Jacksonville, FL 32256

JOSEPH EDMUND BRETT

Jacksonville, FL 32220

W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kiley, Timothy Edward

1350 Havendale Blvd Nw

Winter Haven, FL 33881-1386

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Whitaker, Edward Gilbert

2700 University Blvd W Ste A1

Jacksonville, FL 32217-2120

Other Attorneys

Achem, Sami R Jr

4686 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257-6189

Darnell, John Henry II

4190 Belfort Rd Ste 300

Jacksonville, FL 32216-1460

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 4/27/22 AT 1:30PM

4/25/2022- D145- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 4/27/22 AT 1:30PM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF CSO J.W. DUGGER ON 5/3/22 AT 10AM

4/25/2022- D144- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF CSO J.W. DUGGER ON 5/3/22 AT 10AM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DANE JENSEN ON 5/6/22 AT 1:30PM

4/25/2022- D143- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DANE JENSEN ON 5/6/22 AT 1:30PM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF FRANKIE MACK ON 5/6/22 AT 2:30PM

4/25/2022- D142- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF FRANKIE MACK ON 5/6/22 AT 2:30PM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ERIC GABRIEL MD ON 5/5/22 AT 9AM

4/25/2022- D141- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ERIC GABRIEL MD ON 5/5/22 AT 9AM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 5/2/22 AT 10:15AM

4/25/2022- D140- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 5/2/22 AT 10:15AM

MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -COMPLETELY SETTLED

4/22/2022- D139- MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -COMPLETELY SETTLED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE

4/20/2022- D138- ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE

4/20/2022- D137- ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ALLEGING FAULT OF NON-PARTIES AND/OR APPORTIONMENT

4/20/2022- D136- ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ALLEGING FAULT OF NON-PARTIES AND/OR APPORTIONMENT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ALLEGING FAILURE TO USE SEATBELT

4/20/2022- D135- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ALLEGING FAILURE TO USE SEATBELT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 05/02/22 @ 10:15AM VIA ZOOM

4/12/2022- D134- NOTICE OF HEARING ON 05/02/22 @ 10:15AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 04/19/2022 @230PM VIA ZOOM

4/11/2022- D133- NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 04/19/2022 @230PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIDEOTAPED/ OF FRANKIE MACK ON 05/06/22 @ 2:30PM ZOOM MEETING

4/4/2022- D132- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIDEOTAPED/ OF FRANKIE MACK ON 05/06/22 @ 2:30PM ZOOM MEETING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIDEOTAPED/ OF DANE JENSEN ON 05/06/22 @ 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM

4/1/2022- D131- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIDEOTAPED/ OF DANE JENSEN ON 05/06/22 @ 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT WW GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC'S)

3/30/2022- D130- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT WW GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC'S) TO PLTF'S THIRD

3/30/2022- D129- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC'S) TO PLTF'S THIRD

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS INC'S)

3/30/2022- D128- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS INC'S)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 4/27/22 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF CSO J.W. DUGGER ON 5/3/22 AT 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DANE JENSEN ON 5/6/22 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF FRANKIE MACK ON 5/6/22 AT 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ERIC GABRIEL MD ON 5/5/22 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 5/2/22 AT 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2022; MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -COMPLETELY SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3838933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFTS., JOSEPH EDMUND BRETT AND FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS,INC. (PLTF, JEFFREY C. JOHNSON'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., JOSEPH EDMUND BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH EDMUND BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darnell, John Henry II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACHEM, SAMI