This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/29/2023 at 07:04:30 (UTC).

JEA VS CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 JEA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEA

Defendants

CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A.

JIM OVERTON, TAX COLLECTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cheek, James Edward III

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT : PLAINTIFF'S - # 2 APPRAISAL - APPRAISAL REPORT PARCEL 804 GREYSTONE OFFICE PARK

5/2/2023- D29- EXHIBIT : PLAINTIFF'S - # 2 APPRAISAL - APPRAISAL REPORT PARCEL 804 GREYSTONE OFFICE PARK

EXHIBIT : PLAINTIFF'S - # 1 GENERAL - NOTICE OF FILING CONSTRUCTION PLANS

5/2/2023- D28- EXHIBIT : PLAINTIFF'S - # 1 GENERAL - NOTICE OF FILING CONSTRUCTION PLANS

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

5/2/2023- D26- NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

CASE FEES PAID: $105,900.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145

5/2/2023- D25- CASE FEES PAID: $105,900.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145

CASE FEES PAID: $105,900.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145

5/2/2023- D23- CASE FEES PAID: $105,900.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145

ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

5/2/2023- D22- ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF (JEA) PETITION FOR ORDER OF TAKING (PARCEL 8004 -CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC) -PLTF

5/1/2023- D27- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF (JEA) PETITION FOR ORDER OF TAKING (PARCEL 8004 -CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC) -PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES CHEEK III FOR CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

5/1/2023- D21- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES CHEEK III FOR CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

NOTICE OF HEARING OF EVIDENTIARY/ ON JEA'S PETITION FOR ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804 ON 05/02/2023 @1100AM VIA ZOOM

4/19/2023- D20- NOTICE OF HEARING OF EVIDENTIARY/ ON JEA'S PETITION FOR ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804 ON 05/02/2023 @1100AM VIA ZOOM

ANSWER (DEFT CD 119 GREYSTONE LLC'S) RESERVATIONS AND DEFENSES TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

4/18/2023- D19- ANSWER (DEFT CD 119 GREYSTONE LLC'S) RESERVATIONS AND DEFENSES TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

ORDER DENYING MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING

4/14/2023- D18- ORDER DENYING MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING

RESPONSE (CD 119 GREYSTONE LLC) IN OPPOSITION TO JEAS EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

4/5/2023- D17- RESPONSE (CD 119 GREYSTONE LLC) IN OPPOSITION TO JEAS EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (TAX COLLECTORS)

4/5/2023- D12- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (TAX COLLECTORS)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON JEA'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

4/5/2023- D11- NOTICE OF HEARING ON JEA'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE - DEFT

4/4/2023- D16- ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE - DEFT

NOTICE OF FILING CONTRUCTION PLANS FOR THE PROJECT - PLTF

4/4/2023- D15- NOTICE OF FILING CONTRUCTION PLANS FOR THE PROJECT - PLTF

JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804 OTHER

4/4/2023- D14- JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804 OTHER

OBJECTION TO JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804 - DEFT., CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

4/4/2023- D13- OBJECTION TO JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804 - DEFT., CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed: $105,900.00; Paid: $105,900.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/25/2023; EXHIBIT : PLAINTIFF'S - # 2 APPRAISAL - APPRAISAL REPORT PARCEL 804 GREYSTONE OFFICE PARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/25/2023; EXHIBIT : PLAINTIFF'S - # 1 GENERAL - NOTICE OF FILING CONSTRUCTION PLANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/3/2023; NOTICE OF DEPOSIT - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $105,900.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2023; RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145 REVISED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $105,900.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4394145

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2023; ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 804

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/3/2023; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF (JEA) PETITION FOR ORDER OF TAKING (PARCEL 8004 -CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC) -PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/1/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES CHEEK III FOR CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20588 PAGE 295-298 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4336571

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (JEA'S FIRST) TO CD119 GREYSTONE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JEA'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO CD119 GREYSTONE,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; DECLARATION OF TAKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20588 PAGE 295-298

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; EMINENT DOMAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less