This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 03:03:13 (UTC).

JEA, A BODY POLITIC AND CORPORATE VS THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 JEA, A BODY POLITIC AND CORPORATE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEA, A BODY POLITIC AND CORPORATE

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hernandez, Elizabeth Kathleen

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 2140

Jacksonville, FL 32207-9029

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/31/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/31/2023- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION -PLAINTIFF

1/31/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4323122

1/31/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4323122

SUMMONS ISSUED THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

1/31/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/21/23 AT 01:30PM FOR THE HERTZ CORPORATION C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A., CORPORATE-DONNA MOCH

3/16/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/21/23 AT 01:30PM FOR THE HERTZ CORPORATION C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A., CORPORATE-DONNA MOCH

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

3/16/2023- D9- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/21/23 AT 01:30PM FOR THE HERTZ CORPORATION C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A., CORPORATE-DONNA MOCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/16/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4323122

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less