This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 19:19:57 (UTC).

JARYD HURST VS SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 JARYD HURST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JARYD HURST

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Defendant

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zanakos, Christina Nicole

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-3070

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

5/4/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

5/4/2022- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/4/2022- D4- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648

5/5/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648

CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648

5/6/2022- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/20/2022 12:00PM SERVED A CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC

5/24/2022- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/20/2022 12:00PM SERVED A CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/20/2022 12:00PM SERVED A CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$15,000 <= $30,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $400.00; Paid : $400.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; RECEIPT NUMBER 4145648 HAD A REFUND OF $400.00 AMOUNT SENT TO DAVID LOW, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $15000 - $30000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zanakos, Christina Nicole