This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/15/2022 at 23:29:43 (UTC).

JACQULYN BOSKET VS NEW RUE21 LLC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 JACQULYN BOSKET filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NEW RUE21 LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACQULYN BOSKET

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

NEW RUE21 LLC

116 Pine Street, 3Rd Floor, Suite 320

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hiraldo, Manuel Santiago

401 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-2218

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/23/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION)

2/23/2022- D3- COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO NEW RUE21, LLC

2/23/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO NEW RUE21, LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4095673

2/28/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4095673

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NEW RUE 21, LLC ON 03/07/22 @ 1055AM

3/8/2022- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NEW RUE 21, LLC ON 03/07/22 @ 1055AM

MOTION (PLTF'S) FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

4/5/2022- D8- MOTION (PLTF'S) FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION)

4/13/2022- D9- AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION)

MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFT NEW RUE21 LLCS) AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/13/2022- D10- MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFT NEW RUE21 LLCS) AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFT NEW RUE21 LLCS) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2022; MOTION (PLTF'S) FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NEW RUE 21, LLC ON 03/07/22 @ 1055AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4095673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO NEW RUE21, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New rue21, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HIRALDO, MANUEL SANTIAGO