This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 12/01/2021 at 00:26:33 (UTC).

JACOBS CHIRO & WELLNESS CTR A/A/O VANESSA REYNOLDS VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 JACOBS CHIRO WELLNESS CTR A/A/O VANESSA REYNOLDS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOBS CHIRO & WELLNESS CTR A/A/O VANESSA REYNOLDS

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

9800 Fredericksburg Road

San Antonio, TX 78288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4006766

10/11/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4006766

COVER SHEET

10/12/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/12/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/12/2021- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

10/12/2021- D5- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/12/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

10/12/2021- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

10/12/2021- D10- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

11/17/2021- D11- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 11/18/2021 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 11/18/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4006766

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III