This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/26/2022 at 09:10:13 (UTC).

JACKSONVILLE TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY VS A & A Group Investments, Inc. D/B/A Pro Care Cleaners Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 JACKSONVILLE TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against A A Group Investments, Inc D/B/A Pro Care Cleaners. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSONVILLE TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

390 N. Orange Ave.Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

BILL & BONNIE HUNTLEY INVESTMENTS, LTD.

1530 Business Center Drivesuite 4

Fleming Island, FL 32003

WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

413 East Park Avenue

Tallahassee, FL 32301

LA NOPALERA BEACH BLVD. INC.

1731 Eagle Branch Court

Fleming Island, FL 32003

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI A. Wood Ellis F/K/A Lori A. Wood

Jacksonville, FL 32224

LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC

200 S. Orange Avenue

Sarasota, FL 34236

NICOLA MORENO

Jacksonville, FL 32224

Catullo Brothers, Llc., D/B/A Catullo's Italian Restaurant

6260-C Dupont Station Court

Jacksonville, FL 32217

BB FITNESS GROUP, LLC

605 Barbara Lane

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

AMERIS BANK

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Jim Overton, Tax Collector, Duval County, Florida: If Alive, Or If Dead, Any Unknown Spouses Heirs, Devisees, Grantees, Creditors And All Parties Claiming Interest By, Though, Under Or Against A Respondent Named In This Action, And All Persons Having

Jacksonville, FL 32202

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION

4949 Blanding Blvd.

Jacksonville, FL 32224

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

13939 Shipwreck Circle North

Jacksonville, FL 32224

Centennial Bank Successor By Merger With Stonegate Bank

124 West Capitol Ave.Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Wasabi Sushi Fang, Inc.

1650 San Pablo Road Southsuite 5

Jacksonville, FL 32224

P.B. Homeowners Association, Inc. A/K/A Pelican Bay Homeowner's Association, Inc., A Florida Corporation

15 Simmons Road

Jacksonville, FL 32233

Midfirst Bank, A Federally Chartered Savings Association

501 Nw Grand Blvd.

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

MIKHAEL Rodriguez A/K/A Mikhael Rodriguez-Aviles

Jacksonville, FL 32224

CARL J BRIGANDI

Jacksonville, FL 32224

BIG LOT STORES, INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milian, Richard Nash

Attorney at Broad and Cassel LLP

390 N Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801-1687

Defendant Attorney

Glass, Michelle Leigh

7545 Centurion Pkwy Ste 103

Jacksonville, FL 32256-4118

Other Attorneys

Humphrey, Bruce B

320 Town Plaza Ave # 120

Ponte Vedra, FL 32081-5166

Howell, Lauren Elissa

824 A1A N Ste 305

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-3332

Schoeppel, Kevin Allan

6550 Saint Augustine Rd Ste 105

Jacksonville, FL 32217-2847

Riley, James McKee

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1811

Dionisio, Kimberly Koleos

1646 W Snow Ave Ste 53

Tampa, FL 33606-2837

Tomkiewicz, Michael Joseph

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1724

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

1/25/2022- D164- LETTER TO JUDGE FROM NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

FINAL JUDGMENT (STIPULATED) WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS BILL & BONNIE HUNTLEY INVESTMENTS, LTD (PARCEL 119)

1/21/2022- D165- FINAL JUDGMENT (STIPULATED) WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS BILL & BONNIE HUNTLEY INVESTMENTS, LTD (PARCEL 119)

JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MODIFICATION

1/14/2022- D163- JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MODIFICATION

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP A/K/A XECUTIVE CUTZ

1/14/2022- D161- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP A/K/A XECUTIVE CUTZ

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JUSTANET CORP A/K/A JUSTANET ENTERPRISES

1/14/2022- D160- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JUSTANET CORP A/K/A JUSTANET ENTERPRISES

UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT FOR AMERIS BANK AS THERE IS NO VALID RETURN OF SERVICE ON THE DOCKET

1/14/2022- D159- UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT FOR AMERIS BANK AS THERE IS NO VALID RETURN OF SERVICE ON THE DOCKET

MOTION FOR DEFAULT YANEISYS M. MARTINEZ

1/13/2022- D158- MOTION FOR DEFAULT YANEISYS M. MARTINEZ

MOTION FOR DEFAULT XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP A/K/A XECUTIVE CUTZ

1/13/2022- D157- MOTION FOR DEFAULT XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP A/K/A XECUTIVE CUTZ

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUSTANET CORP A/K/A JUSTANET ENTERPRISES

1/13/2022- D156- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUSTANET CORP A/K/A JUSTANET ENTERPRISES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AMERIS BANK

1/13/2022- D155- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AMERIS BANK

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 04/22/2021 10:51AM NON SERVE, YANESYS M MARTINEZ

1/13/2022- D154- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 04/22/2021 10:51AM NON SERVE, YANESYS M MARTINEZ

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 04/20/2021 11:09AM SERVED A CORPORATION, XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP; AKA

1/13/2022- D153- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 04/20/2021 11:09AM SERVED A CORPORATION, XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP; AKA

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 04/20/2021 11:09AM SERVED A CORPORATION, JUSTANET CORP AKA

1/13/2022- D152- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 04/20/2021 11:09AM SERVED A CORPORATION, JUSTANET CORP AKA

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 04/22/2021 10:51AM NON SERVE, YANEISYS M MARTINEZ

1/13/2022- D151- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 04/22/2021 10:51AM NON SERVE, YANEISYS M MARTINEZ

LETTER TO JUDGE AHO FROM SEMONIA DAVIS FRP.-RECEIVED FROM JUDGES RUN, DOCKETED AT THE REQUEST OF THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

6/14/2021- D116- LETTER TO JUDGE AHO FROM SEMONIA DAVIS FRP.-RECEIVED FROM JUDGES RUN, DOCKETED AT THE REQUEST OF THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (RESPONDENT, BANKER LIFE AND CASUALTY COMPANYS) TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

5/28/2021- D99- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (RESPONDENT, BANKER LIFE AND CASUALTY COMPANYS) TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (JACKSONVILLE STORAGE BUILDERS, LLC'S) /RESERVATIONS/TO THE PETITION

5/26/2021- D88- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (JACKSONVILLE STORAGE BUILDERS, LLC'S) /RESERVATIONS/TO THE PETITION

ORDER APPROVING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/1/2021- D150- ORDER APPROVING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/25/2022; LETTER TO JUDGE FROM NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/25/2022; FINAL JUDGMENT (STIPULATED) WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS BILL & BONNIE HUNTLEY INVESTMENTS, LTD (PARCEL 119)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2022; JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT FOR YANEISYS M. MARTINEZ AS THERE IS NO VALID RETURN OF SERVICE ON THE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP A/K/A XECUTIVE CUTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JUSTANET CORP A/K/A JUSTANET ENTERPRISES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT FOR AMERIS BANK AS THERE IS NO VALID RETURN OF SERVICE ON THE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT YANEISYS M. MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT XECUTIVE CUTZ BARBERSHOP A/K/A XECUTIVE CUTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUSTANET CORP A/K/A JUSTANET ENTERPRISES

    Read MoreRead Less
204 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/ADDL DEFENDANT FEE @$2.50ea; Assessed : $127.50; Paid : $127.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $528.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3833764

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; NOTICE TO WATER MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; DECLARATION OF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19634 PAGE 903-932

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATSON CIVIL CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LA NOPALERA BEACH BLVD, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC DBA MEADWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant