This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 12/03/2021 at 06:24:24 (UTC).

INTEGRATIVE HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS A/A/O ANA B LOPEZ BENITEZ VS MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 INTEGRATIVE HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS A/A/O ANA B LOPEZ BENITEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTEGRATIVE HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS A/A/O ANA B LOPEZ BENITEZ

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/12/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/12/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.-PLAINTIFF

10/12/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007107

10/13/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007107

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

10/13/2021- D7- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 10-26-2021 FOR MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. , ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO CHRISTINA TORRES

10/28/2021- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 10-26-2021 FOR MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. , ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO CHRISTINA TORRES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/9/2021- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM 1.998.

11/9/2021- D10- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM 1.998.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 11/23/2021 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM 1.998.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 10-26-2021 FOR MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. , ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO CHRISTINA TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 11/23/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007107

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATIVE HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS, INC. A/A/O JENNIFER FOISY is a litigant

Latest cases where MGA Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B