This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 11/29/2021 at 00:13:38 (UTC).

INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O TIFFANY LOWE VS NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O TIFFANY LOWE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O TIFFANY LOWE

Saint Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

P O Box 1623

Winstom Salem, NC 27102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/11/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/11/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

10/11/2021- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO DEFENDANT -PLAINTIFF

10/11/2021- D5- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO DEFENDANT -PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/11/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

10/11/2021- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007121

10/13/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007121

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

10/13/2021- D10- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE

11/23/2021- D12- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 11/23/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO DEFENDANT -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III