This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 06:55:29 (UTC).

HOPE TAYLOR O/B/O MINOR CHILD K.C. VS CHICK-FIL-A, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 HOPE TAYLOR O/B/O MINOR CHILD K C filed an Other lawsuit against CHICK-FIL-A, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOPE TAYLOR O/B/O MINOR CHILD K.C.

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendants

CHICK-FIL-A, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor, Kevin Brandon Jr

1680 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6104

Defendant Attorney

Larosiere, Matthew Michael

6964 Houlton Cir

Lake Worth, FL 33467-8744

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4254275

10/10/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4254275

COVER SHEET

10/11/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/11/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHICK-FIL-A, INC.

10/11/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHICK-FIL-A, INC.

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CT CORPORATION SYSTEM ON 10/20/22 AT 12:26PM

11/1/2022- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CT CORPORATION SYSTEM ON 10/20/22 AT 12:26PM

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/9/2022- D7- AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING LLC

11/9/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4277443

11/9/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4277443

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MATTHEW LAROSIERE FOR RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING, LLC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/14/2022- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MATTHEW LAROSIERE FOR RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING, LLC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

12/14/2022- D11- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

12/14/2022- D12- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

12/14/2022- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) TO DEFTS FIRST SET

12/22/2022- D14- NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) TO DEFTS FIRST SET

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFTS FIRST

12/22/2022- D15- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFTS FIRST

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFTS FIRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) TO DEFTS FIRST SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MATTHEW LAROSIERE FOR RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING, LLC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/15/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4277443

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/15/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO RIVER CITY RESTAURANT CONSULTING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/15/2022; AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/1/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CT CORPORATION SYSTEM ON 10/20/22 AT 12:26PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/11/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHICK-FIL-A, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/11/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/11/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/11/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/11/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4254275

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHICK FIL A INC. is a litigant