This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 19:16:58 (UTC).

HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC A/A/O MYEIKA S JOHNSON VS SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC A/A/O MYEIKA S JOHNSON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC A/A/O MYEIKA S JOHNSON

St Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

790 Pasquinelli Drive

Westmont, IL 60559

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

8/26/2021- D10- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3972060

8/25/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3972060

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

8/24/2021- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

8/24/2021- D6- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2021- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2021- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

8/24/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

8/24/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 12/16/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3972060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III