This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 12/20/2021 at 15:04:43 (UTC).

HEATHER WHEELER DIXON Et Al VS D.R. HORTON, INC. - JACKSONVILLE

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 HEATHER WHEELER DIXON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against D R HORTON, INC - JACKSONVILLE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HILTON DIXON

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

HEATHER WHEELER DIXON

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant

D.R. HORTON, INC. - JACKSONVILLE

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Smith, Kavon Patrick

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

Esposito, Luca G

Florin Roebig777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

O'Brien, Neil Patrick

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/22/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/22/2021- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO D.R. HORTON INC. - JACKSONVILLE

11/22/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO D.R. HORTON INC. - JACKSONVILLE

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4035457

11/22/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4035457

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/30/2021 09:11AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, D.R. HORTON, INC

11/30/2021- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/30/2021 09:11AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, D.R. HORTON, INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/30/2021 09:11AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, D.R. HORTON, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4035457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO D.R. HORTON INC. - JACKSONVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D R HORTON INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Kavon P., ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Brien, Neil Patrick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPOSITO LUCA G