This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 12/29/2021 at 19:23:50 (UTC).

HEALTHCORE WELLNESS, P.A. A/A/O PAULA GARFINKEL VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 HEALTHCORE WELLNESS, P A A/A/O PAULA GARFINKEL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTHCORE WELLNESS, P.A. A/A/O PAULA GARFINKEL

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/1/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/1/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

12/1/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4040878

12/1/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4040878

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

12/1/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF CASE MANGEMENT ORDER BY THE PARTIES

12/9/2021- D7- ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF CASE MANGEMENT ORDER BY THE PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2021; ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF CASE MANGEMENT ORDER BY THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4040878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B