This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/13/2022 at 04:05:59 (UTC).

HASSAN HOSSEINI VS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 HASSAN HOSSEINI filed an Other lawsuit against LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASSAN HOSSEINI

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nooney, Jeffery Scott Jr

1680 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6104

Defendant Attorney

Hackett, Leonard Thomas

Attorney at Vernis & Bowling of North Florida

Vernis & Bowling Of North Florida, 4309 Salisbury Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32216-6123

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Brecher, David S

301 W Bay St Ste 1443

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5184

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF HASSAN HOSSEINI 10/13/2022 @1000AM VIA ZOOM

8/22/2022- D26- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF HASSAN HOSSEINI 10/13/2022 @1000AM VIA ZOOM

WITNESS LIST (DEFT'S PRELIMINARY FACT)

8/22/2022- D25- WITNESS LIST (DEFT'S PRELIMINARY FACT)

WITNESS LIST (PLTF'S FACT)

8/8/2022- D24- WITNESS LIST (PLTF'S FACT)

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

7/25/2022- D23- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

7/9/2022- D21- ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETIAL CONFERENCE P/T 08/03/2023 @400PM RM739

7/9/2022- D20- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETIAL CONFERENCE P/T 08/03/2023 @400PM RM739

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S

7/7/2022- D19- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFENDANT'S

6/29/2022- D18- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFENDANT'S

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/27/2022- D17- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/27/2022- D16- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/27/2022- D15- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/27/2022- D14- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFT

6/14/2022- D13- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - DEFT

6/10/2022- D12- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT) OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF

6/10/2022- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT) OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT) TO PLTF

6/10/2022- D10- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT) TO PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT) TO PLTF COMPLAINT

6/10/2022- D9- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT) TO PLTF COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

5/31/2022- D8- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 8:30 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/23/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF HASSAN HOSSEINI 10/13/2022 @1000AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/22/2022; WITNESS LIST (DEFT'S PRELIMINARY FACT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/8/2022; WITNESS LIST (PLTF'S FACT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/11/2022; JURY TRIAL 08/14/2023 8:30 AM - 0 NO COURT ROOM ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/11/2022; ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/11/2022; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETIAL CONFERENCE P/T 08/03/2023 @400PM RM739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/29/2022; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEONARD HACKETT FOR LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4154100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brecher, David S