This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/17/2022 at 04:14:59 (UTC).

GWENDOLYN WADE VS RANDY L. WADE

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 GWENDOLYN WADE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RANDY L WADE. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HORKAN, MAUREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HORKAN, MAUREEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GWENDOLYN WADE

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Respondent

RANDY L. WADE

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wilkerson, Gerald Laverne II

5345 Ortega Blvd Ste 3

Jacksonville, FL 32210-8443

Respondent Attorney

Sacks, Adam Lee

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE of SACKS & Sacks, P.A.

1646 Emerson St Ste B

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6153

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leitman, Steven Alan

Po Box 51363

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32240-1363

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

1/26/2022- D7- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4075217

1/26/2022- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4075217

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF / GWENDOLYN WADE / ATTY.

1/26/2022- D4- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF / GWENDOLYN WADE / ATTY.

MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND FOR OTHER RELIEF / WIFE, GWENDOLYN WADE / ATTY.

1/26/2022- D5- MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND FOR OTHER RELIEF / WIFE, GWENDOLYN WADE / ATTY.

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / GWENDOLYN WADE

1/31/2022- D9- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / GWENDOLYN WADE

COVER SHEET

1/26/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

1/26/2022- D6- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

SUMMONS ISSUED -RANDY L. WADE

1/26/2022- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED -RANDY L. WADE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ADAM SACKS FOR RANDY WADE

2/15/2022- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ADAM SACKS FOR RANDY WADE

ANSWER TO PETITION (WIFE'S), FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ATY/FOR THE HUSBAND

3/9/2022- D12- ANSWER TO PETITION (WIFE'S), FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ATY/FOR THE HUSBAND

REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 ATY/FOR HUSBAND

3/9/2022- D13- REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 ATY/FOR HUSBAND

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/GWENDOLYN WADE/ATTY

4/12/2022- D14- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/GWENDOLYN WADE/ATTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MEDIATOR/STEVEN A LEITMAN-MEDIATOR

5/7/2022- D15- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MEDIATOR/STEVEN A LEITMAN-MEDIATOR

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY - ADAM L. SACKS, ESQ.

7/6/2022- D18- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY - ADAM L. SACKS, ESQ.

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 8/11/2022 @ 9:55AM VIA ZOOM

8/10/2022- D23- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 8/11/2022 @ 9:55AM VIA ZOOM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2022; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 8/11/2022 @ 9:55AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING -FINAL-AUGUST 11, 2022 @ 9:55 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RANDY LAMAR WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISSLOURE - RANDY WADE / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - GWENDOLYN WADE / ATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY - ADAM L. SACKS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION -STEVEN A. LEITMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 07/28/2022 10:0 AM/STEVEN A LEITMAN-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MEDIATOR/STEVEN A LEITMAN-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4075217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND FOR OTHER RELIEF / WIFE, GWENDOLYN WADE / ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -RANDY L. WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF / GWENDOLYN WADE / ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leitman, Steven Alan