This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 12/01/2021 at 12:03:47 (UTC).

GULF IMAGING A/A/O BERTHA QUINN VS FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 GULF IMAGING A/A/O BERTHA QUINN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF IMAGING A/A/O BERTHA QUINN

Saint Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 108817

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4003128

9/29/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4003128

COVER SHEET

10/6/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/6/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/6/2021- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D5- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/6/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

10/12/2021- D10- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

11/16/2021- D11- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 11/18/2021 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 11/18/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4003128

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III