Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/12/2021 at 10:05:19 (UTC).

GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY VS NADEGE S BARTHELEMY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NADEGE S BARTHELEMY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLE, KAREN K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLE, KAREN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Respondent

NADEGE S BARTHELEMY

Jacksonville, FL 32254

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE - NADEGE BARTHELEMY

5/12/2021- D25- RESPONSE - NADEGE BARTHELEMY

MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

4/15/2021- D20- MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

COVER SHEET

4/15/2021- D9- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

4/15/2021- D4- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE NADEGE S BARTHELEMY 04/26/2021 3:02 PM

4/28/2021- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE NADEGE S BARTHELEMY 04/26/2021 3:02 PM

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

4/29/2021- D23- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

4/15/2021- D10- DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D3- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860911

4/15/2021- D2- CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860911

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2021; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE -GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - NADEGE BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; RESPONSE - NADEGE BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/3/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE NADEGE S BARTHELEMY 04/26/2021 3:02 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/POSTAL CHARGES/FAM SERV/$12; Assessed : $12.00; Paid : $12.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; PROOF OF RESIDENCY - GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY - GUIRAUD BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO NADEGE BARTHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; PROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less