This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/27/2023 at 14:52:08 (UTC).

GREGORY L STANDRIDGE VS ALYSSA STANDRIDGE

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 GREGORY L STANDRIDGE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALYSSA STANDRIDGE. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREGORY L STANDRIDGE

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Respondent

ALYSSA STANDRIDGE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Clark, John Joseph

Attorney at The Lasky Law Firm

2950 Halcyon Ln Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32223-6691

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN CLARK FOR GREGORY STANDRIDGE

1/6/2023- D3- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN CLARK FOR GREGORY STANDRIDGE

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

1/6/2023- D7- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

1/6/2023- D8- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309442

1/6/2023- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309442

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialDescription: REFUNDCHECK; Assessed: $409.00; Paid: $409.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; RECEIPT NUMBER 4309442 HAD A REFUND OF $409.00 AMOUNT SENT TO THE LASKY LAW FIRM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; RECEIPT NUMBER 4309442 REVISED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2023; ORDER ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE AND PROVIDE REFUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/17/2023; MOTION TO DISMISS CASE AND PROVIDE REFUND (PETITIONER'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed: $0.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309442

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ATY/FOR THE HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN CLARK FOR GREGORY STANDRIDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less