Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/12/2021 at 08:19:01 (UTC).

GABRIELLA EMILEE GRANDLE VS BRIAN MATTHEW GRANDLE

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 GABRIELLA EMILEE GRANDLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRIAN MATTHEW GRANDLE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLE, KAREN K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLE, KAREN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GABRIELLA EMILEE GRANDLE

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Respondent

BRIAN MATTHEW GRANDLE

Glen Burnie, MD 21061

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

6/3/2021- D7- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE

4/21/2021- D6- RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D5- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860241

4/14/2021- D3- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860241

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/4/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/22/2021; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/POSTAL CHARGES/FAM SERV/$12; Assessed : $12.00; Paid : $12.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860241

    Read MoreRead Less