Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/13/2021 at 15:14:19 (UTC).

FLORIDA LAND TRUST NO. 2021-MARCH 17, BENJIE SPERLING, AS TRUSTEE VS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 FLORIDA LAND TRUST NO 2021-MARCH 17, BENJIE SPERLING, AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, N A. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA LAND TRUST NO. 2021-MARCH 17, BENJIE SPERLING, AS TRUSTEE

P.O. Box 817058

Hollywood, FL 33081

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

100 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28255

United Guaranty Residential Insurance Company Of North Carolina

230 N. Elm Street

Greensboro, NC 27420

STEVEN A. MIDYETTE

Jacksonville, FL 32254

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION OF

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khawaja, Rehan Naeem

817 N Main St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3028

Defendant Attorney

Knopf, Allegra

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445-6326

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALLEGRA KNOPF FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

5/6/2021- D14- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALLEGRA KNOPF FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -UNITED GUARANTY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04-28-21 @ 9:50 AM /SERVED TO LARRY DRAUGHN, MAIL CLERK

5/3/2021- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -UNITED GUARANTY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04-28-21 @ 9:50 AM /SERVED TO LARRY DRAUGHN, MAIL CLERK

COMPLAINT SUIT FOR QUIET TITLE

4/15/2021- D4- COMPLAINT SUIT FOR QUIET TITLE

CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861624

4/15/2021- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861624

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

4/15/2021- D5- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

4/15/2021- D3- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( DEFENDANT, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S ) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2021; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALLEGRA KNOPF FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -UNITED GUARANTY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04-28-21 @ 9:50 AM /SERVED TO LARRY DRAUGHN, MAIL CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2021; ANSWER (DEFT MIDYETTE'S) TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2021; AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 04-21-21 @ 11:12 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/OTHER REAL PROP 0-50K 3/6/2018; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNITED GUARANTY RESIDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH CAROLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; STEVEN A. MIDYETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19685 PAGE 1531-1532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT SUIT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; OTHER REAL PROPERTY ACTIONS $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less