This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 03:06:15 (UTC).

FATIMA MURGIC Et Al VS STEVE BAEZ

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 FATIMA MURGIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVE BAEZ. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FATIMA MURGIC

Orlando, FL 32806

JOSH FRICK

Orlando, FL 32806

Defendant

STEVE BAEZ

Jacksonville, FL 32224

Not Classified By Court

ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

ENCOMPAS INSURANCE

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frick, Joshua Tucker

4953 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32806-6957

Other Attorneys

Toma, Melody Kiehl

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073-4388

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFTS) OF FATIMA MURGIC ON 07/12/2022 @100PM VIA ZOOM

5/24/2022- D23- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFTS) OF FATIMA MURGIC ON 07/12/2022 @100PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT)

5/19/2022- D22- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES -DEFENDANT

4/22/2022- D21- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES -DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFTS)

4/12/2022- D20- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFTS)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PLTF TO DEFT'S FIRST

4/7/2022- D19- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PLTF TO DEFT'S FIRST

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S

4/7/2022- D18- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S

4/1/2022- D17- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S

4/1/2022- D16- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT)

3/7/2022- D15- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) AUTOMOBILE/ TO PLTF

3/7/2022- D14- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) AUTOMOBILE/ TO PLTF

ANSWER (DEFT) TO COMPLAINT

3/7/2022- D13- ANSWER (DEFT) TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TOMA, MELODY KIEHI FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS INSURANCE, AND ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

3/7/2022- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TOMA, MELODY KIEHI FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS INSURANCE, AND ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE 2/16/22 @ 5:55 PM TO STEVE BAEZ (PERSONAL)

2/22/2022- D11- RETURN OF SERVICE 2/16/22 @ 5:55 PM TO STEVE BAEZ (PERSONAL)

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4085427

2/11/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4085427

SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVE BAEZ

2/11/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVE BAEZ

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - PLTF

2/11/2022- D7- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., STEVE BAEZ - PLTF

2/11/2022- D6- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., STEVE BAEZ - PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO STEVE BAEZ (PLTF)

2/11/2022- D5- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO STEVE BAEZ (PLTF)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFTS) OF FATIMA MURGIC ON 07/12/2022 @100PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2022; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/11/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PLTF TO DEFT'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/11/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) AUTOMOBILE/ TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4085427

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVE BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., STEVE BAEZ - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO STEVE BAEZ (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO STEVE BAEZ (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL STATE INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toma, Melody Kiehl