This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/22/2021 at 02:04:46 (UTC).

FABIO SILVA VS BRUCE SAPP III Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 FABIO SILVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRUCE SAPP III. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FABIO SILVA

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

BRUCE SAPP III

Glen St. Mary, FL 32040

CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC.

1777 N. Mcduff Avenue

Jacksonville, FL 32254

RAQUEL RENTZ

Macclenny, FL 32063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Portigliatti, Stefano Di

136 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5406

Defendant Attorney

Byrne, Jessica Estelle

The Bank Of America Tower 50 N Laura St Ste 1675

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3611

Other Attorneys

Obringer, Michael Joseph

The Bank Of America Tower 50 N Laura St Ste 1675

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3611

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S ) AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S

11/5/2021- D42- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S ) AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S) TO PLTF'S FIRST

11/5/2021- D41- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S) TO PLTF'S FIRST

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S) REGARDING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/5/2021- D40- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S) REGARDING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION BY DEFT CUSTOM CONCRETE INC

10/25/2021- D39- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION BY DEFT CUSTOM CONCRETE INC

REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

10/25/2021- D38- REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

MOTION TO STRIKE (PLTFS) DEFT BRUCE SAPP, III AFFIRMAITVE DEFENSES

10/22/2021- D37- MOTION TO STRIKE (PLTFS) DEFT BRUCE SAPP, III AFFIRMAITVE DEFENSES

OBJECTION (PLTF'S NOTICE OF) TO DEFT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

10/22/2021- D35- OBJECTION (PLTF'S NOTICE OF) TO DEFT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFT BRUCE SAPP III

10/21/2021- D36- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFT BRUCE SAPP III

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST RAQUEL RENTZ

10/20/2021- D34- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST RAQUEL RENTZ

MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERKS/ AS TO RAQUEL RENTZ

10/19/2021- D33- MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERKS/ AS TO RAQUEL RENTZ

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR RAQUEL RENTZ ON 09/23/21 @ 425PM

10/19/2021- D32- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR RAQUEL RENTZ ON 09/23/21 @ 425PM

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT CUSTOM CONCRETE INC'S) REGARDING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/14/2021- D31- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT CUSTOM CONCRETE INC'S) REGARDING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (AND OBJECTIONS) (TO PLTFS FIRST) (DEFT., CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC)

10/14/2021- D30- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (AND OBJECTIONS) (TO PLTFS FIRST) (DEFT., CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (AND OBJECTIONS) (TO PLTF FIRST) (DEFT., CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC)

10/14/2021- D29- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (AND OBJECTIONS) (TO PLTF FIRST) (DEFT., CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S CUSTOM CONCRETE INC FIRST)

10/12/2021- D28- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S CUSTOM CONCRETE INC FIRST)

PRIVILEGE LOG (PLAINTIFF'S)

10/1/2021- D27- PRIVILEGE LOG (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

10/1/2021- D26- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

10/1/2021- D25- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S ) AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S) TO PLTF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2021; PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT BRUCE SAPP III'S) REGARDING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2021; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION BY DEFT CUSTOM CONCRETE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/25/2021; REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/25/2021; MOTION TO STRIKE (PLTFS) DEFT BRUCE SAPP, III AFFIRMAITVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; OBJECTION (PLTF'S NOTICE OF) TO DEFT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFT BRUCE SAPP III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST RAQUEL RENTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERKS/ AS TO RAQUEL RENTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT BRUCE SAPP III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT BRUCE SAPP III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RAQUEL RENTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FO CUSTOM CONCRETE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BRUCE SAPP III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3931687

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBRINGER, MICHAEL JOSEPH