This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 12/22/2021 at 15:05:57 (UTC).

EVELYN SEETRAM VS AMOS FIELDS Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 EVELYN SEETRAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMOS FIELDS. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVELYN SEETRAM

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

AMOS FIELDS

Jacksonville, FL 32208

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

Ct Corporation System1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

IRA VON HICKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, James D III

50 N Laura St Ste 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3646

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4037276

11/23/2021- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4037276

COVER SHEET

11/24/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/24/2021- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED (CORPORATE) TO EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

11/24/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED (CORPORATE) TO EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMOS FIELDS

11/24/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMOS FIELDS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IRA VON HICKS

11/24/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO IRA VON HICKS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO IRA VON HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMOS FIELDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED (CORPORATE) TO EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4037276

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, James D III