This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/10/2023 at 01:06:44 (UTC).

EVA C ROGERS VS MARLOW A ROGERS

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 EVA C ROGERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARLOW A ROGERS. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EVA C ROGERS

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Respondent

MARLOW A ROGERS

Jacksonville, FL 32234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Clark, John Joseph

Attorney at The Lasky Law Firm

2950 Halcyon Ln Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32223-6691

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN CLARK FOR EVA ROGERS

1/4/2023- D3- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN CLARK FOR EVA ROGERS

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /EVA C. ROGERS

1/4/2023- D7- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /EVA C. ROGERS

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

1/4/2023- D10- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: CLARK, JOHN JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSNET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2023; ACKNOWLEDGEMENT - MARLOW ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / MARLOW A ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; ANSWER AND WAIVER / MARLOW ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS / MARLOW ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; NOTICE OF HEARING --- 03/07/2023 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed: $409.00; Paid: $409.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4308111

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/EVA C. ROGERS/ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /EVA C. ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /EVA C. ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN CLARK FOR EVA ROGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less