This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/16/2023 at 11:08:03 (UTC).

ESAU LAURENCIN Et Al VS KB HOME Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 ESAU LAURENCIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESAU LAURENCIN

SANDRA LAURENCIN

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

KB HOME

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC.

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

PEDAL PAINTING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Brien, Neil Patrick

Other Attorneys

Sutton, Rouselle Alton III

Anderson, Denise M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE (PLTF'S) OF SETTLEMENT

2/24/2023- D20- NOTICE (PLTF'S) OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

1/27/2023- D19- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC. 12/20/2022 2:00 PM

1/24/2023- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC. 12/20/2022 2:00 PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDAL PAINTING INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/20/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDAL PAINTING INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

12/5/2022- D16- ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285330

11/29/2022- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285330

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

11/23/2022- D14- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

11/23/2022- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE)

11/23/2022- D12- ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

11/4/2022- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

11/4/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME

11/4/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4263548

10/20/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4263548

COMPLAINT/PETITION -PLTF

10/20/2022- D6- COMPLAINT/PETITION -PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

10/20/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

10/20/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME

10/20/2022- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME

COVER SHEET

10/20/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; NOTICE (PLTF'S) OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC. 12/20/2022 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDAL PAINTING INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/5/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENCIV/COUNTER/X-CLAIM; Assessed: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285330

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4263548

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION -PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less