*********************X-MA
10/20/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Construction Defect
Duval, Florida
DEES, ROBERT M
ESAU LAURENCIN
Palm Harbor, FL 34683
SANDRA LAURENCIN
Palm Harbor, FL 34683
KB HOME
C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
KB HOME FLORIDA LLC.
C/O Corporation Service Company, As Ra, 1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC
C/O Corporation Service Company, As Ra, 1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
PEDAL PAINTING INC
O'Brien, Neil Patrick
777 Alderman Rd
Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604
Sutton, Rouselle Alton III
4767 New Broad St
Orlando, FL 32814-6405
Anderson, Denise M
400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300
Tampa, FL 33602-4305
2/24/2023- D20- NOTICE (PLTF'S) OF SETTLEMENT
1/27/2023- D19- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
1/24/2023- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC. 12/20/2022 2:00 PM
12/20/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDAL PAINTING INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
12/5/2022- D16- ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
11/29/2022- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285330
11/23/2022- D14- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
11/23/2022- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
11/23/2022- D12- ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE)
11/4/2022- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC
11/4/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC
11/4/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/02/2022 08:55AM SERVED THE WITHIN NAMED CORPORATION, KB HOME
10/20/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4263548
10/20/2022- D6- COMPLAINT/PETITION -PLTF
10/20/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC
10/20/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME FLORIDA LLC
10/20/2022- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME
10/20/2022- D2- COVER SHEET
DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; NOTICE (PLTF'S) OF SETTLEMENT
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 1/30/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC. 12/20/2022 2:00 PM
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 12/21/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDAL PAINTING INC DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 12/5/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
[-] Read LessFinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDescription: CIR/GENCIV/COUNTER/X-CLAIM; Assessed: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 11/29/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285330
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 11/29/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 11/29/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC
[-] Read LessFinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4263548
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION -PLTF
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME FLORIDA LLC
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -KB HOME
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; COVER SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketEntered: 10/24/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT
[-] Read Less