This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 02:49:34 (UTC).

ERIC MARTIN HALL Et Al VS ANDY JOEL JAVIER Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 ERIC MARTIN HALL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDY JOEL JAVIER. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERIC MARTIN HALL

Salt Springs, FL 32134

NATASHA HALL

Salt Springs, FL 32134

Defendants

DENNIS WILLIAM FULFECK

Jacksonville, FL 32224

ANDY JOEL JAVIER

Winter Park, FL 32792

NICOLE RICH

Vista, CA 92081

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LaFountain, Nicholas A

4201 E Silver Springs Blvd

Ocala, FL 34470-5001

Defendant Attorney

Myers, Mark A

4190 Belfort Rd Ste 222

Jacksonville, FL 32216-1459

Other Attorneys

Therrell, Kendra B

76 S Laura St Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5403

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF DENNIS WILLIAM WULFECK ON 10/13/22 AT 12PM VIA ZOOM

8/3/2022- D49- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF DENNIS WILLIAM WULFECK ON 10/13/22 AT 12PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S CROSS) OF PLAINTIFF ERIC HALL 08/02/2022 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

8/1/2022- D48- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S CROSS) OF PLAINTIFF ERIC HALL 08/02/2022 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER

7/28/2022- D47- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER

7/28/2022- D46- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF NATASHA HALL) TO ANDY JAVIER

7/28/2022- D45- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF NATASHA HALL) TO ANDY JAVIER

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S ERIC HALL) TO ANDY JAVIER

7/28/2022- D44- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S ERIC HALL) TO ANDY JAVIER

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFT

7/18/2022- D43- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF ERIC HALL'S) TO DENNIS WULFECK

6/29/2022- D42- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF ERIC HALL'S) TO DENNIS WULFECK

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S NATASHA HALL) TO DENNIS WULFECK

6/29/2022- D41- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S NATASHA HALL) TO DENNIS WULFECK

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/29/2022- D40- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/29/2022- D39- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, NATASHA HALL

6/27/2022- D38- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, NATASHA HALL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, ERIC MARTIN HALL

6/27/2022- D37- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, ERIC MARTIN HALL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, NATASHA HALL

6/27/2022- D36- REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, NATASHA HALL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, ERIC MARTIN HALL

6/27/2022- D35- REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) TO PLAINTIFF, ERIC MARTIN HALL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) FROM PLAINTIFF

6/27/2022- D34- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S ) FROM PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/27/2022- D33- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, ANDY JOEL JAVIER, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTFS

6/16/2022- D32- REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTFS

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) OF DENNIS WILLIAM WULFECK ON 10/13/22 AT 12PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER'S CROSS) OF PLAINTIFF ERIC HALL 08/02/2022 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT ANDY JOEL JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF NATASHA HALL) TO ANDY JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S ERIC HALL) TO ANDY JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF ERIC HALL'S) TO DENNIS WULFECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S NATASHA HALL) TO DENNIS WULFECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., NICOLE RICH - PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., ANDY JOEL JAVIER - PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT., DENNIS WILLIAM WULFECK (FIRST)-PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT., NICOLE RICH (FIRST)-PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT., ANDY JOEL JAVIER (FIRST)-PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/18/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4132876

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THERRELL, KENDRA