This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/31/2022 at 01:18:37 (UTC).

EQUITY TRUST CO CUSTODIAN FBO STEVEN M. ROSENBLOOM IRA VS PAYTON ROGERS REAL ESTATE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 EQUITY TRUST CO CUSTODIAN FBO STEVEN M ROSENBLOOM IRA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAYTON ROGERS REAL ESTATE LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY TRUST CO CUSTODIAN FBO STEVEN M. ROSENBLOOM IRA

1835 Third Street N.

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

Defendants

PAYTON ROGERS REAL ESTATE LLC

2944 Post Street

Jacksonville, FL 32205

THE CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

117 W. Duval Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1

Jacksonville, FL 32210

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2

Jacksonville, FL 32210

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3

Jacksonville, FL 32210

HMF FL E LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wainer, David Samuel III

1835 3Rd St N

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250-7469

Defendant Attorney

King, Candyce Michelle

2219 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-4315

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/3/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $956.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324

6/2/2022- D41- CASE FEES PAID: $956.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324

RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO FORD MILLER AND WAINER PA

6/2/2022- D40- RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO FORD MILLER AND WAINER PA

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND REMOVE THE LIS PENDENS BOOK 20292 PAGE 969-970

5/19/2022- D38- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND REMOVE THE LIS PENDENS BOOK 20292 PAGE 969-970

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT

4/26/2022- D37- MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-20-22 @ 9 AM IN CR 510 // REMARKS: DEFTS MOTIONF FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED RESPONSE DUE BY 4-26-22

4/26/2022- D36- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-20-22 @ 9 AM IN CR 510 // REMARKS: DEFTS MOTIONF FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED RESPONSE DUE BY 4-26-22

ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

4/26/2022- D35- ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT HMF FL E LLC

4/8/2022- D32- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT HMF FL E LLC

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3 NKA MARK COFFEY

4/8/2022- D33- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3 NKA MARK COFFEY

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 NKA JOHN YARAN

4/8/2022- D34- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 NKA JOHN YARAN

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFT HMF FL E LLC

4/7/2022- D31- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFT HMF FL E LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3 NKA MARK COFFEY

4/7/2022- D30- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3 NKA MARK COFFEY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 NKA JOHN YARAN

4/7/2022- D29- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 NKA JOHN YARAN

NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED CMC ORDER AND MEMO

4/5/2022- D27- NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED CMC ORDER AND MEMO

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2 ON 2/28/22

3/18/2022- D26- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2 ON 2/28/22

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3 ON 2/28/22 @ 3:50 PM

3/18/2022- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3 ON 2/28/22 @ 3:50 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 ON 2/28/22 @ 3:50 PM

3/18/2022- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 ON 2/28/22 @ 3:50 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - HMF FL E, LLC ON 3/7/22 @ 2:30 PM

3/18/2022- D23- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - HMF FL E, LLC ON 3/7/22 @ 2:30 PM

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $956.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2022; RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO FORD MILLER AND WAINER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2022; RECEIPT NUMBER 4080324 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : via Video Conference; Courtroom : Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND REMOVE THE LIS PENDENS BOOK 20292 PAGE 969-970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2022; MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2022; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-20-22 @ 9 AM IN CR 510 // REMARKS: DEFTS MOTIONF FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED RESPONSE DUE BY 4-26-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/8/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEFT HMF FL E LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - PAYTON ROGERS REAL ESTATE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20134 PAGE 2462-2462

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE OF 4823 SHELBY AVENUE (VERIFIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAYTON ROGERS REAL ESTATE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Steven M Cobin Traditional IRA is a litigant

Latest cases where City Of Jacksonville A Municipal Corporation Of The State Of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer King, Candyce Michelle