This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/05/2023 at 08:59:56 (UTC).

EMILY ANNE SUSSMAN, LAURIE SUSSMAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 EMILY ANNE SUSSMAN, LAURIE SUSSMAN was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHEMER, JACK M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHEMER, JACK M.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LAURIE SUSSMAN

MICHAEL SUSSMAN

Not Classified By Court

EMILY ANNE SUSSMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Henry, Tiera Lynn

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Calley, David Craig

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $400.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4283015

11/14/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $400.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4283015

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID CALLEY FOR EMILY SUSSMAN

11/29/2022- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID CALLEY FOR EMILY SUSSMAN

APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

11/14/2022- D2- APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

11/14/2022- D3- APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

PETITION FOR APPT. OF GUARDIAN ADVOCATE

11/14/2022- D4- PETITION FOR APPT. OF GUARDIAN ADVOCATE

OATH AND DESIGNATION

11/14/2022- D6- OATH AND DESIGNATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT

11/28/2022- D8- ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT

LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP BOOK 20558 PAGE 2116-2116

1/19/2023- D15- LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP BOOK 20558 PAGE 2116-2116

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4321003

1/27/2023- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4321003

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Copy/Certification Fee - Probate; Assessed: $7.00; Paid: $7.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4321003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2023; REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/23/2023; ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN ADVOCATE (FOR DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY FS 393.12) BOOK 20558 PAGE 2109-2110 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/23/2023; LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP BOOK 20558 PAGE 2116-2116 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN ADVOCATE (FOR DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY FS 393.12) BOOK 20558 PAGE 2109-2110

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP BOOK 20558 PAGE 2116-2116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: HENRY, TIERA LYNN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; PETITIONER: SUSSMAN, LAURIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2023; REPORT OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID CALLEY FOR EMILY SUSSMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: PB/Guardianship Person and/or Property 09/04/2018; Assessed: $400.00; Paid: $400.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $400.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4283015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; OATH AND DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; OATH AND DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; PETITION FOR APPT. OF GUARDIAN ADVOCATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; GUARDIAN OF PERSON AND PROPERTY FOR ADULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less