This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 11/17/2022 at 16:04:32 (UTC).

Elevate Health Center A/A/O Edward Van Dyke VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Elevate Health Center A/A/O Edward Van Dyke filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elevate Health Center A/A/O Edward Van Dyke

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thompson, Nicholas Richard

189 S Orange Ave Ste 840S

Orlando, FL 32801-3254

Defendant Attorney

Sommers, Alyson Lynn

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073-4388

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT

4/26/2022- D31- ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT

ORDER DIRECTING STATUS UPDATE FROM THE PARTIES

3/23/2022- D30- ORDER DIRECTING STATUS UPDATE FROM THE PARTIES

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S)

3/1/2022- D29- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

2/14/2022- D28- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

2/14/2022- D27- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

2/14/2022- D26- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S REGARDING REASONABLENESS

2/14/2022- D25- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S REGARDING REASONABLENESS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

2/14/2022- D24- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS

1/21/2022- D23- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS

1/21/2022- D22- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

1/21/2022- D21- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES /DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS -DEFENDANT

1/21/2022- D20- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES /DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS -DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS -DEFENDANT

11/8/2021- D19- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS -DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /SUPPLEMENTAL RE: RELATEDNESS - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D18- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /SUPPLEMENTAL RE: RELATEDNESS - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RE: REASONABLENESS - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D17- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RE: REASONABLENESS - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFENDANT RE: APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D16- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFENDANT RE: APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) RE: REASONABLENESS - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D15- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) RE: REASONABLENESS - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) RE: RELATEDNESS - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2021- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) RE: RELATEDNESS - PLAINTIFF

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2022; ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; ORDER DIRECTING STATUS UPDATE FROM THE PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/1/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S REGARDING REASONABLENESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING RELATEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL ADMISSIONS REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/23/2021; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDANT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/25/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALYSON SOMMERS FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS<$100 3/1/2012; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $55.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3864826

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; NOTICE OF TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BROWARD) COSO-19-015555

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; DOCKET LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less