This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/14/2022 at 20:06:52 (UTC).

DUNNS CROSSING HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC VS ONEMAIN FIN GROUP BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 DUNNS CROSSING HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ONEMAIN FIN GROUP BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FIN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, JULIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, JULIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNNS CROSSING HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC

8777 San Jose Boulevard,, Building A, Suite 200,

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Defendants

ROLAND L JACKSON

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROLAND L JACKSON

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Jacksonville, FL 32218

ONEMAIN FIN GROUP BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FIN

C/O Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sordian, Emily McRee

Suite 200, Bldg A, 8777 San Jose Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32217-4213

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

7/18/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

7/18/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20364 PAGE 1777-1777

7/18/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20364 PAGE 1777-1777

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

7/18/2022- D5- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ROLAND L. JACKSON

7/18/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ROLAND L. JACKSON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROLAND L. JACKSON

7/18/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROLAND L. JACKSON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.1

7/18/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.2

7/18/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION

7/18/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION

CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4195173

7/18/2022- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4195173

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed : $440.00; Paid : $440.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4195173

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROLAND L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ROLAND L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20364 PAGE 1777-1777

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUNNS CROSSING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE