This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/26/2022 at 15:27:00 (UTC).

D.R. HORTON, INC. JACKSONVILLE VS A.D.W. CONSTRUCTION, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 D R HORTON, INC JACKSONVILLE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A D W CONSTRUCTION, LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.R. HORTON, INC. JACKSONVILLE

9111 W College Pointe Drive

Fort Myers, FL 33919

Defendants

A.D.W. CONSTRUCTION, LLC

1633 Farm Way, Suite 504

Middleburg, FL 32068

ADKINS ELECTRIC, INC.

10477 New Kings Road

Jacksonville, FL 32219

AIR TO AIR, INC.

11578 Davis Creek Court

Jacksonville, FL 32256

ALLSTATE ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

7447 Salisbury Road

Jacksonville, FL 32256

BRADCORP FLORIDA II, LLC

13136 95Th Street North

Largo, FL 33773

BURTON PAINT AND COATINGS, INC.

2848 Fennel Avenue

Middelburg, FL 32068

BURTON PAINT, INC.

2848 Fennel Avenue

Middleburg, FL 32068

CARTERS CONCRETE SOLUTIONS, INC.

6376 Lee Lane

Bryceville, FL 32009

CEMPLEX GROUP FLORIDA LLC FKA BH GROUP HOLDINGS FL

13136 95Th Street North

Largo, FL 33773

CHANCEY METAL PRODUCTS, INC. NKA JOE LEE CEE CORP

3352 Commorant Cove Drive

Jacksonville, FL 32223

COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA, INC.

1603 S 8Th Street

Amelia Island, FL 32034

COASTAL ROOFING, INC.

2311 Industrial Drive

Panama City, FL 32402

D.R. DREAM HOMES, INC.

1864 Happy Vale Ct

Middleburg, FL 32068-3131

FRATTLE STAIRS & RAILS, INC.

465 Tresca Road

Jacksonville, FL 32225

GARDENS SOUTH-JAX, INC.

12489 San Jose Blvd., Suite #4

Jacksonville, FL 32223

G&T CONTRACTOR SERVICES, LLC

8480 Manresa Avenue

Jacksonville, FL 32244

GRANGER LUMBER-HARDWARE, INC. N/K/A GRANGER HOLDIN

570 Golden Links Drive

Orange Park, FL 32073

JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING, LLC

54207 Fouracre Circle

Callahan, FL 32011

KING CONCRETE ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A KING CONCRET

3880 Firestone Road

Jacksonville, FL 32210

82 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas, Justin Michael

9111 W College Pointe Dr

Fort Myers, FL 33919-3379

Other Attorneys

Metzger, Joseph Thomas Tucker

3018 W Horatio St

Tampa, FL 33609-4122

Bigman, Jeffrey Errol

444 Seabreeze Blvd Ste 900

Daytona Beach, FL 32118-3953

Grant, Siobhan Earlyn Pennington

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

Grimm, Reed W

50 N Laura St Ste 3500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3663

Russo, Andrew Frank

302 Knights Run Ave Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33602-5955

Beck, Joshua Seth

901 Clint Moore Rd Ste C

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2876

Mendez, Amanda Marie

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

Bahadoran, Sina

1221 Brickell Ave Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131-3247

Silver, Jay Edward

231 E Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3305

Daniel, Megan Nicole

55 1St St S

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3995

Appelbaum, Rebecca C

1101 E Cumberland Ave Suite 201H-#153

Tampa, FL 33602-4231

Haine-Roberts, Logan Galbraith

800 3Rd Ave Fl 13

New York, NY 10022-7688

Darroch, Robert M

6751 Professional Pkwy W Ste 103

Sarasota, FL 34240-8449

Silva, Jason Henry Tamayo

6751 Professional Pkwy Ste 103

Sarasota, FL 34240-8449

Rosengarten, Yonit

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

Ryan, Fay Elizabeth

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

Harvey, Holly S

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

Poljak, Stephen John

2400 E Commercial Blvd Ste 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308-4044

Packer, Michael Adam

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, 100 Ne 3Rd Ave Fl 11

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1176

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANYS) DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

6/22/2022- D312- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANYS) DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WENDY STEIN FULTON FOR BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY

6/22/2022- D311- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WENDY STEIN FULTON FOR BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SCOT SAMIS FOR AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATION AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

6/22/2022- D310- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SCOT SAMIS FOR AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATION AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE ON 6/17/22

6/20/2022- D309- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE ON 6/17/22

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 6/17/22

6/20/2022- D308- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 6/17/22

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP ON 6/17/22

6/20/2022- D307- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP ON 6/17/22

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STARDA SERVICES INC JOSEPH STRADA ON 06/13/2022 @1125AM BY ANGIE PEREZ

6/14/2022- D306- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STARDA SERVICES INC JOSEPH STRADA ON 06/13/2022 @1125AM BY ANGIE PEREZ

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NORTH FLORIDA HOME WORX INC NKA BARCO ROOFING CONSTRUCTION INC ON 06/13/2022 @238PM BY ANTHONY

6/14/2022- D305- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NORTH FLORIDA HOME WORX INC NKA BARCO ROOFING CONSTRUCTION INC ON 06/13/2022 @238PM BY ANTHONY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/14/2022- D304- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -BANKERS INSURANCE CO

6/13/2022- D303- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -BANKERS INSURANCE CO

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (DEFT BANKERS INSURANCE CO'S)

6/13/2022- D302- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (DEFT BANKERS INSURANCE CO'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID WEBER FOR BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

6/13/2022- D301- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID WEBER FOR BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE CO'S) TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

6/9/2022- D299- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE CO'S) TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL PACKER FOR SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

6/9/2022- D298- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL PACKER FOR SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL YONIT ROSENGARTEN FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, WAUSAU BUSINESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AND AMERICAN FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

6/8/2022- D300- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL YONIT ROSENGARTEN FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, WAUSAU BUSINESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AND AMERICAN FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AARON KONSTAM FOR JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

6/8/2022- D296- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AARON KONSTAM FOR JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF D.R. HORTON, INC - JACKSONVILLE FIRST) TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

6/8/2022- D295- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF D.R. HORTON, INC - JACKSONVILLE FIRST) TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF D.R. HORTON, INC - JACKSONVILLE FIRST) TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

6/8/2022- D294- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF D.R. HORTON, INC - JACKSONVILLE FIRST) TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

298 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANYS) DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WENDY STEIN FULTON FOR BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SCOT SAMIS FOR AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATION AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE ON 6/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 6/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP ON 6/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STARDA SERVICES INC JOSEPH STRADA ON 06/13/2022 @1125AM BY ANGIE PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NORTH FLORIDA HOME WORX INC NKA BARCO ROOFING CONSTRUCTION INC ON 06/13/2022 @238PM BY ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/14/2022; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -BANKERS INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
395 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2022; NOTICE OF FILING (PLAINTIFF'S) THE ATTACHED EXHIBITS, BATES NUMBERED PAGES 000001 THROUGH 000318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2022; NOTICE OF FILING #36 ( PLAINTIFF'S ) THE ATTACHED EXHIBITS, BATES NUMBERED PAGES 012080 THRU 012486, OF THE COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED ON 4/4/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2022; NOTICE OF FILING #35 ( PLAINTIFF'S ) THE ATTACHED EXHIBITS, BATES NUMBERED PAGES 011734 THRU 012079, COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED ON 4/4/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/ADDL DEFENDANT FEE @$2.50ea; Assessed : $235.00; Paid : $235.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $636.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4123935

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHANCEY METAL PRODUCTS, INC, is a litigant

Latest cases where CEMPLEX GROUP FLORIDA LLC is a litigant