This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/24/2023 at 18:10:39 (UTC).

DIANA CRUZ Et Al VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 DIANA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

DIANA CRUZ

Defendants

MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iannucci, Nicolas Bart

Defendant Attorney

Lake, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/19/2023- D34- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/19/2023- D33- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDNAT MAXINE GENETTE REDDING'S)

5/12/2023- D32- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDNAT MAXINE GENETTE REDDING'S)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

4/21/2023- D31- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) DIANA CRUZ

4/21/2023- D30- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) DIANA CRUZ

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

4/21/2023- D29- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF DIANA CRUZ

4/21/2023- D28- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF DIANA CRUZ

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

4/21/2023- D27- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) TO PLTF DIANA CRUZ

4/21/2023- D26- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) TO PLTF DIANA CRUZ

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT., MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

2/24/2023- D10- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT., MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

2/24/2023- D9- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

2/24/2023- D8- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) TO DEFT., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

2/24/2023- D7- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) TO DEFT., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) TO MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

2/24/2023- D6- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) TO MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (PLTF)

2/24/2023- D5- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (PLTF)

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (PLTF) WITH SECOND AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2021-09

2/24/2023- D4- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (PLTF) WITH SECOND AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2021-09

COMPLAINT

2/24/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

2/24/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDNAT MAXINE GENETTE REDDING'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) DIANA CRUZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF DIANA CRUZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF MICHAEL AGUDELO MEJIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) TO PLTF DIANA CRUZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL LAKE FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT., MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) TO DEFT., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) TO MAXINE GENETTE REDDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (PLTF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (PLTF) WITH SECOND AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2021-09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less