This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 12/27/2021 at 00:39:32 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY VS CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Po Box 19519

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33318

Defendants

THE UNKNOW HEIRS OF LILLIAN C.SHOSTAK A/K/A LILLIAN CORRINE SHOSTAK, DECEASED

Jacksonville, FL 32202

CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY

501 West Adams Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

JONATHAN C SHOSTAK

Jacksonville, FL 32218

LINDA FISHER

Plaquemine, LA 70764

MARK FISHER

Bensalem, PA 19020

PAMELA FISHER

Jacksonville, FL 32218

PATRICIA SHOSTAK

Ocean Springs, MS 39564

REBECCA SHOSTAK

Jacksonville, FL 32206

THE STATE OF FLORIDA

The Capitol Pl-01

Tallahassee, FL 32399

THOMAS W FISHER-ARGUST JR

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Jacksonville, FL 32218

THE CITY OF JACXKSONVILLE, FLORIDA

Unknown, FL 00000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diaz, Roy Alan

499 Nw 70Th Ave Ste 309

Plantation, FL 33317-7574

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

6/23/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

6/23/2021- D20- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CASE FEES PAID: $691.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3923635

6/23/2021- D21- CASE FEES PAID: $691.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3923635

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 08/24/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

6/25/2021- D23- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 08/24/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA AND THE CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/14/2021- D25- ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA AND THE CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (STATE OF FLORIDA'S)

7/23/2021- D26- ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (STATE OF FLORIDA'S)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

7/23/2021- D27- NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT ( VERIFIED ) FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

6/23/2021- D3- COMPLAINT ( VERIFIED ) FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO : REMARKS - DISMISSED - PLAINTIFF ATTY FAILED TO APPEAR

8/25/2021- D28- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO : REMARKS - DISMISSED - PLAINTIFF ATTY FAILED TO APPEAR

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 19896 PAGE 2165-2165

8/30/2021- D29- ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 19896 PAGE 2165-2165

MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL ENTERED 08/24/21 AND REOPEN CASE

8/31/2021- D30- MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL ENTERED 08/24/21 AND REOPEN CASE

ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL ENTERED AUGUST 24, 2021 AND REOPENING CASE.

9/8/2021- D31- ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL ENTERED AUGUST 24, 2021 AND REOPENING CASE.

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - DEFT JONATHAN SHOSTAK [3:21-BK-02381]

10/6/2021- D32- SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - DEFT JONATHAN SHOSTAK [3:21-BK-02381]

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12-3-21 @ 9 AM IN RM 510; - SVC PENDING

10/7/2021- D33- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12-3-21 @ 9 AM IN RM 510; - SVC PENDING

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/19/2021- D35- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/25/2021- D36- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2021; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 12/03/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12-3-21 @ 9 AM IN RM 510; - SVC PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2021; SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - DEFT JONATHAN SHOSTAK [3:21-BK-02381]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2021; ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL ENTERED AUGUST 24, 2021 AND REOPENING CASE. BOOK 19907 PAGE 1543-1546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL ENTERED 08/24/21 AND REOPEN CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 19896 PAGE 2165-2165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO : REMARKS - DISMISSED - PLAINTIFF ATTY FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LINDA FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JONATHAN C. SHOSTAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY, CLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19796 PAGE 1266-1267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; COMPLAINT ( VERIFIED ) FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF DUVAL COUNTY FLORID is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant