This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/15/2022 at 19:22:15 (UTC).

DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS MARCUS L MASON Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARCUS L MASON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SACKS, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SACKS, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8777 San Jose Boulevard,, Building A, Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Defendants

MARCUS L MASON

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sordian, Emily McRee

Suite 200, Bldg A, 8777 San Jose Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32217-4213

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/17/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

6/17/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20328 PAGE 2334-2334

6/17/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20328 PAGE 2334-2334

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

6/17/2022- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARCUS L MASON

6/17/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARCUS L MASON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

6/17/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

6/17/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CASE FEES PAID: $470.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4175256

6/17/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $470.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4175256

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed : $440.00; Paid : $440.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $470.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4175256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARCUS L MASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20328 PAGE 2334-2334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAYBREAK WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE