This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 19:18:07 (UTC).

D.A.N JOINT VENTURE III, L.P., AN OHIO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS DEXTER GEORGE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 D A N JOINT VENTURE III, L P , AN OHIO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEXTER GEORGE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.A.N JOINT VENTURE III, L.P., AN OHIO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O Lorium Law, 101 Ne 3Rd Ave., Suite 1800

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

DEXTER GEORGE

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Storfer, Richard Bernard

101 Ne 3Rd Ave Ste 1800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1252

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT

3/15/2023- D42- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE COURT - PLAINTIFF OTHER

3/2/2023- D41- MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE COURT - PLAINTIFF OTHER

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

2/3/2023- D40- AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

2/3/2023- D39- AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

1/19/2023- D37- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME /PLAINTIFF'S TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUES 48.161

12/21/2022- D36- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME /PLAINTIFF'S TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUES 48.161

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUTES 48.161 - PLAINTIFF

12/12/2022- D35- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUTES 48.161 - PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (AMENDED), 11-22-22 AT 10:41 A.M., TO BREADLEY BEECH, REGULATORY SPECIALIST FOR SECRETARY OF STATE, ON BEHALF OF DEXTER GEORGE

12/9/2022- D34- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (AMENDED), 11-22-22 AT 10:41 A.M., TO BREADLEY BEECH, REGULATORY SPECIALIST FOR SECRETARY OF STATE, ON BEHALF OF DEXTER GEORGE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11-22-22 AT 10:41A.M., ACCEPTED BY BRADLEY BEECH AS REGULATORY SPECIALIST FOR THE SECRETARY OF STATE

11/28/2022- D33- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11-22-22 AT 10:41A.M., ACCEPTED BY BRADLEY BEECH AS REGULATORY SPECIALIST FOR THE SECRETARY OF STATE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEXTER GEORGE

11/20/2022- D32- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEXTER GEORGE

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4280969

11/18/2022- D30- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4280969

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEXTER GEORGE

11/18/2022- D29- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEXTER GEORGE

AMENDED COMPLAINT -PLAINTIFF

11/18/2022- D28- AMENDED COMPLAINT -PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEXTER GEORGE

10/5/2022- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEXTER GEORGE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME /PLAINTIFF'S TO SERVE COMPLAINT

8/23/2022- D24- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME /PLAINTIFF'S TO SERVE COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED (PLURIES) DEXTER GEORGE

8/23/2022- D23- SUMMONS ISSUED (PLURIES) DEXTER GEORGE

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4221401

8/22/2022- D21- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4221401

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PLURIES) DEXTER GEORGE

8/22/2022- D20- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PLURIES) DEXTER GEORGE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE COURT - PLAINTIFF OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2023; AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2023; AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DEXTER GEORGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME /PLAINTIFF'S TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUES 48.161

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/12/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUTES 48.161 - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2022; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (AMENDED), 11-22-22 AT 10:41 A.M., TO BREADLEY BEECH, REGULATORY SPECIALIST FOR SECRETARY OF STATE, ON BEHALF OF DEXTER GEORGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2022; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE FOR DEXTER GEORGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DEXTER GEORGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/26/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4130217

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DEXTER GEORGE -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less