Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:29:24 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS SEAD TAHIROVIC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEAD TAHIROVIC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

3100 Breckenridge Blvd. Suite 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

SEAD TAHIROVIC

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hudson, Yacenda Kela

1515 S Federal Hwy Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432-7404

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SEAD TAHIROVIC AT 8426 NEWTON ROAD JACKSONVILLE, FL 32216

4/9/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SEAD TAHIROVIC AT 8426 NEWTON ROAD JACKSONVILLE, FL 32216

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -PLAINTIFF

4/9/2021- D5- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4/9/2021- D4- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO SEAD TAHIROVIC AT 8426 NEWTON ROAD JACKSONVILLE, FL 32216 ,PLAINTIFF

4/9/2021- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO SEAD TAHIROVIC AT 8426 NEWTON ROAD JACKSONVILLE, FL 32216 ,PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET

4/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855114

4/8/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855114

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SEAD TAHIROVIC AT 8426 NEWTON ROAD JACKSONVILLE, FL 32216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/20/2021 1:30 PM - 503 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO SEAD TAHIROVIC AT 8426 NEWTON ROAD JACKSONVILLE, FL 32216 ,PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855114

    Read MoreRead Less