This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/12/2023 at 02:19:26 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaplan, Joshua Matthew

Defendant Attorney

Kaniuk, Ronald Scott

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/21/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2/21/2023- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA - PLAINTIFF

2/21/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

2/21/2023- D5- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338604

2/23/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338604

SUMMONS ISSUED ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA

2/23/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 03/13/2023 @ 12:40PM TO ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA (PERSONAL)

3/13/2023- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 03/13/2023 @ 12:40PM TO ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA (PERSONAL)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/31/2023- D10- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RONALD KANIUK FOR ISMARAY ANCA AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS -DEFENDANT

3/31/2023- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RONALD KANIUK FOR ISMARAY ANCA AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS -DEFENDANT

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

4/6/2023- D12- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

4/10/2023- D13- STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/11/2023; STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RONALD KANIUK FOR ISMARAY ANCA AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS -DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 03/13/2023 @ 12:40PM TO ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA (PERSONAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed: $175.00; Paid: $175.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/06/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338604

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISMARAY BLANCO ANCA - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less