This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 22:11:32 (UTC).

CRAWFORD ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC. VS CHERYL PEARLMAN

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 CRAWFORD ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHERYL PEARLMAN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAWFORD ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.

50 N. Laura Streetsuite 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

CHERYL PEARLMAN

Newton, CT 06470

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, James D III

50 N Laura St Ste 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3646

Defendant Attorney

Fugitt, Tyler Lee

1400 Prudential Dr Ste 5

Jacksonville, FL 32207-8177

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/1/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

6/1/2021- D3- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

6/1/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED -CHERYL PEARLMAN

6/1/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED -CHERYL PEARLMAN

CASE FEES PAID: $450.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681

6/1/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $450.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON: CHERYL PEARLMAN -ON- 06/11/2021 @ 10:30 A.M.

6/15/2021- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON: CHERYL PEARLMAN -ON- 06/11/2021 @ 10:30 A.M.

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3934967

7/9/2021- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3934967

MOTION TO STRIKE (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/10/2021- D11- MOTION TO STRIKE (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/10/2021- D12- ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM -DEFT., CHERYL PEARLMAN

6/30/2021- D9- ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM -DEFT., CHERYL PEARLMAN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TYLER FUGITT FOR CHERYL PEARLMAN AND ELECTRONIC DESIGNATION

7/20/2021- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TYLER FUGITT FOR CHERYL PEARLMAN AND ELECTRONIC DESIGNATION

STIPULATION (JOINT) OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19896 PAGE 433-434

8/26/2021- D14- STIPULATION (JOINT) OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19896 PAGE 433-434

RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO THE LAW OFFICES OF JAMES D. ALLEN, P.A.

9/10/2021- D16- RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO THE LAW OFFICES OF JAMES D. ALLEN, P.A.

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681

9/10/2021- D17- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO THE LAW OFFICES OF JAMES D. ALLEN, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; STIPULATION (JOINT) OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19896 PAGE 433-434

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/21/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TYLER FUGITT FOR CHERYL PEARLMAN AND ELECTRONIC DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2021; ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2021; MOTION TO STRIKE (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3934967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/Counter/Cross-Claim>2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $295.00; Paid : $295.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/2/2021; ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM -DEFT., CHERYL PEARLMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/17/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON: CHERYL PEARLMAN -ON- 06/11/2021 @ 10:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $450.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3903681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED -CHERYL PEARLMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19757 PAGE 1968-1968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2021; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2021; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUGITT, TYLER LEE