This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/16/2022 at 15:21:45 (UTC).

CRAIG COOKSEY Et Al VS GEICO INSURANCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 CRAIG COOKSEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INSURANCE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSICA COOKSEY

Jacksonville, FL 32210

CRAIG COOKSEY

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Pob 106171

Atlanta, GA 30348

GEICO INSURANCE

Pob 9091

Macon, GA 31208

MCKINLEY BOUTTE JR

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hooten, Earl Byron II

1725 Blanding Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32210-1963

Defendant Attorney

Lake, Daniel M

4527 Timberloch Dr

Tallahassee, FL 32309-8959

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S)

1/3/2022- D40- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT STATE FARM'S/

12/30/2021- D39- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT STATE FARM'S/

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) DEFT STATE FARM'S/

12/30/2021- D38- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) DEFT STATE FARM'S/

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

12/30/2021- D37- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) DEFT GEICO'S/

12/30/2021- D36- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) DEFT GEICO'S/

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) DEFT GEICO'S/

12/30/2021- D35- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) DEFT GEICO'S/

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S

12/20/2021- D34- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

12/20/2021- D33- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

12/20/2021- D32- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (TO DEFT) (PLTF)

12/20/2021- D31- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (TO DEFT) (PLTF)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (TO DEFT) (PLTF)

12/20/2021- D30- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (TO DEFT) (PLTF)

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLTF CRAIG COOKSEY ONLY)

12/13/2021- D29- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLTF CRAIG COOKSEY ONLY)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS GEICO GENERAL INS. CO. VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/05/2021 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

12/13/2021- D28- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS GEICO GENERAL INS. CO. VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/05/2021 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/05/2021 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

12/13/2021- D27- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/05/2021 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTF., JESSICA COOKSEY (DEFT., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOILE ISURANCE COMPANYS FIRST)

11/24/2021- D26- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTF., JESSICA COOKSEY (DEFT., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOILE ISURANCE COMPANYS FIRST)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY)

11/24/2021- D25- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

11/24/2021- D24- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF JESSICA COOKSEY

11/19/2021- D23- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF JESSICA COOKSEY

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT STATE FARM'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) DEFT STATE FARM'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) DEFT GEICO'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) DEFT GEICO'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) DEFT'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (TO DEFT) (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MCKINLEY BOUTTE, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4018820

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lake, Daniel M